HEART REACH

Charity number: 1163242
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Heart Reach provides a safe, stable & supportive weekly structure for people recovering from mental health problems. Members come & share skills to make and sell artwork and crafts which are sold at Markets & Community Events. Activities comprise cards, badge & jewellery making, mosaics, knitting & crochet.Training is also provided in areas such as IT, web, photography & book-keeping.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 03 June 2019

Total income: £19,643
Total expenditure: £37,422

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 2015: Standard registration
  • 13 November 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 13 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1158632 INCLUSION BARNET
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ART REACH BARNET LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 03/06/2019
Total gross income £19.44k £40.06k £19.64k
Total expenditure £22.23k £32.39k £37.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 June 2019 29 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required