Financial history LLANDRILLO READING ROOM

Charity number: 506655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.12k £10.01k £1.59k £24.88k £8.32k
Total expenditure £6.95k £4.48k £6.68k £22.00k £17.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £11.85k N/A