Financial history KEIGHLEY CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity number: 1163066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.72k £19.98k £19.29k £18.69k £19.19k
Total expenditure £20.45k £15.80k £22.71k £16.36k £16.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A