Financial history THE LVE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164468
Charity reporting is up to date (182 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £201.21k £157.94k £372.18k £372.14k £420.79k
Total expenditure £197.95k £175.56k £317.14k £317.14k £424.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £77.46k £196.20k £40.00k N/A