Financial history HATHERN COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1163357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.47k £20.27k £6.25k £7.70k £9.79k
Total expenditure £6.40k £4.41k £2.52k £3.67k £4.63k
Income from government contracts N/A £4.18k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.10k £10.00k N/A £3.00k £3.00k