Financial history ANNIE WALSH MEMORIAL SCHOOL (AWMS) OLD GIRLS' ASSOCIATION (UK BRANCH)

Charity number: 1165222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £57.86k £48.51k £31.66k £37.13k £49.17k
Total expenditure £56.82k £38.99k £28.94k £29.77k £53.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A