Financial history THE INGRAM ART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.45m £55.90k £540.65k £64.45k £53.94k
Total expenditure £247.66k £225.50k £312.77k £332.98k £317.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.43m N/A £507.50k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £13.78k N/A £24.64k N/A N/A
Income - Other £5.43k N/A £8.51k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £241.61k N/A £295.12k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.05k N/A £17.65k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £31.22k N/A £34.93k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A