Trustees CESTRIA U3A AT CHESTER-LE-STREET
Charity number: 1163334

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorna Thompson | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Parker | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Willan | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY BURTON | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hamilton | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Rule | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Morrell | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bozic MBE | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Atkinson | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LOGAN | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Eleanor Lanigan | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHILVER | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.