Financial history ECKINGTON FRIENDSHIP CLUB

Charity number: 1166746
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £680 £0 £0 £0 £660
Total expenditure £961 £0 £0 £1.75k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A