Financial history THE FRIENDS OF CANFORD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1165196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.11k £8.09k £13.87k £18.23k £19.86k
Total expenditure £18.21k £12.71k £10.32k £17.40k £17.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A