Financial history SILEBY COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1164002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.31k £23.69k £8.15k £8.56k £11.36k
Total expenditure £6.32k £10.49k £12.03k £10.17k £14.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.22k £23.16k £6.30k £5.32k £8.50k