EUROPEAN OPERA CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The European Opera Centre launched in 1997 maintains two broad aims: to help people of high potential move from education to employment in opera; and to develop audiences for opera. Carefully designed projects provide opportunities to singers, repetiteurs and others. Activities include full productions, productions in concert, concerts and recitals, recordings, masterclasses and work in schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
Governance
- 11 November 2015: Standard registration
- 08 September 2016: Funds received from 1058929 THE EUROPEAN OPERA CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Chernysheva-Petrenko | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHRISTOPHER MARK SOLON | Trustee | 09 June 2017 |
|
|||||
FIONA ANN CHAMBERS | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lyndsay Balfour Thomson | Trustee | 15 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.41k | £45.25k | £33.45k | £29.38k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.41k | £45.25k | £10.39k | £33.65k | £38.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £18.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.13k | £27.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF OPERA AND MUSIC THEATRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EUROPEAN OPERA CENTRE
1 HAIGH STREET
LIVERPOOL
MERSEYSIDE
L3 8QB
- Phone:
- 01512913579
- Email:
- bairdk@hope.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window