Accounts and annual returns THE EAST MIDLANDS REGIONAL AREA ASSOCIATION OF THE BRITISH CHAROLAIS CATTLE SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 506849
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 April 2023 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2022 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required