PLACE OF GRACE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Faith and relieve poverty, through the financial support of the 'Place of Grace Foundation' in Bangkok, Thailand, which provides locally, religious celebrations and teaching, religious publications and prayer meetings, and relieves poverty through the provision of a Food Bank and children's activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Thailand
Governance
- 14 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marissa Rose Harris | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Jacklin | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Hanbury | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Joyce Edwards | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.96k | £13.99k | £18.39k | £37.16k | £30.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.91k | £17.19k | £19.88k | £35.71k | £38.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/10/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THAILAND, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, AND PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THAILAND, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 St. Mellion Drive
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG31 9FB
- Phone:
- 07812394348
- Email:
- hello@placeofgraceuk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window