Financial history BUXTON FILM

Charity number: 1165040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/01/2020 04/01/2021 04/01/2022 04/01/2023 04/01/2024
Total gross income £16.15k £2.93k £4.83k £8.45k £11.85k
Total expenditure £10.68k £1.91k £3.24k £7.54k £7.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A