Financial history SOUTHPORT GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 1163781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £510.12k £412.02k £228.12k £393.45k £505.49k
Total expenditure £431.84k £349.39k £234.53k £341.60k £450.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £26.14k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £30.67k N/A N/A N/A £24.73k
Income - Other trading activities £52.85k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £426.60k N/A N/A N/A £428.55k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £52.21k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £336.01k N/A N/A N/A £352.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.42k N/A N/A N/A £16.13k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £89.42k N/A N/A N/A £81.79k