Financial history WOODLAND CORNER

Charity Number: 1168815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £152.10k £146.61k £149.56k £194.09k £220.84k
Total expenditure £126.43k £122.65k £151.91k £166.08k £194.80k
Income from government contracts £81.23k £80.12k £61.68k £68.88k £90.11k
Income from government grants £14.44k £19.29k £2.50k £4.80k N/A