THE SKATEBOARDING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity deliver a programme to teach children and young people to learn to skateboard, in a structured and supportive environment, as a platform to develop their skills and abilities to enable them to fulfil their potential and participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JOHN HEATH ROMPANI | Chair | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Johnston-Flint | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hughes | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Davies | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Leach | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.55k | £0 | £0 | £6.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99 | £1.37k | £99 | £99 | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH SKATEBOARDING, TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND ABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL AND PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) TO PROMOTE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF SKATEBOARDING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
215 New North Road
LONDON
N1 7BF
- Phone:
- 07779021506
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window