Financial history PEACE PARTNERS

Charity number: 1166456
Charity reporting is up to date (133 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.28k £21.26k £17.68k £20.12k £28.95k
Total expenditure £29.41k £21.10k £21.50k £19.78k £29.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A