HASTINGS UNITARIAN CHURCH CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO is the promotion of religion in accordance with the principals of the General Assembly of Unitarian and Free Christian Churches. We provide a place of worship to serve the local community of Hastings and Rother districts of East Sussex through the use of its building and its members time for the promotion of educational, spiritual and charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 18 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CHARLES SANDERS | Chair | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Wood | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Nicholas Clark-Lowes | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Lesley Kaye Larcombe | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LEMON | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Safar Wisby | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Williamson | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr NORMAN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 03 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.09k | £34.20k | £79.42k | £19.04k | £30.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.69k | £80.48k | £13.74k | £89.41k | £28.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 18 APR 2016 AMENDED ON 03 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hastings Unitarian Church
South Terrace
HASTINGS
TN34 1SA
- Phone:
- 07918110926
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window