KENT STREET COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday morning evening Christian worship service Weekly prayer meeting and bible study Youth Club - providing various activities for those who are 10-16 years old and opportunities to go on outings Weekly free social morning / evening events for the local community, with a Christian ethos. Providing spiritual and practical support and help as needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warrington
- Macedonia
- Romania
Governance
- 06 July 2016: Standard registration
- KENT STREET INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Holmes | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Kinsey | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Cooper | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Alice Banner | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHELDON ROBERT | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER RUTH PRESCOTT | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.99k | £41.49k | £45.70k | £54.67k | £38.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.69k | £40.52k | £53.25k | £47.52k | £41.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCT 2015 as amended on 19 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST CONNEXION. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kent Street Community Church
Kent Street
WARRINGTON
WA4 1BT
- Phone:
- 07761838256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window