Financial history CORNWALL COMMUNITY FLOOD FORUM

Charity number: 1166604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023 01/09/2024
Total gross income £57.50k £52.51k £20.01k £34.44k £89.42k
Total expenditure £38.60k £32.20k £17.64k £13.47k £65.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £20.00k N/A £51.92k
Income from government grants £50.00k £45.00k N/A £29.43k £37.50k