Financial history SANDWELL CHURCHES LINK

Charity Number: 1167003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £52.48k £28.33k £69.70k £128.33k £120.59k
Total expenditure £28.98k £36.69k £75.09k £74.97k £90.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £16.95k N/A