Financial history Gloucester Rugby Foundation

Charity number: 1165303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £279.95k £182.97k £293.74k £291.75k £635.27k
Total expenditure £276.02k £187.57k £287.52k £302.64k £592.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £103.54k £45.28k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £49.70k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £155.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £162.98k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £317.29k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £592.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0