STOCKPORT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of audio recordings to the blind, partially blind and temporally vision impaired
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Stockport
Governance
- 10 January 1978: Standard registration
- THE STOCKPORT TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PAUL RAMSDEN | Chair | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Charles Jarvis | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Petronella Margaretha Anna Sillitoe-Van der Hoorn | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Hillary | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE EDNA BATES | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARY RAMSDEN | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARIE KENRICK | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|||||
BARRIE JAMES TURLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | £6.14k | £4.13k | £2.92k | £5.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33k | £5.49k | £3.39k | £4.35k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28/11/1977 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 13 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE WITH A TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MEANS THEY CANNOT ACCESS WRITTEN MATERIAL, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ENTERTAINMENT IN AUDIO FORMAT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Fords Lane
Bramhall
Stockport
SK7 1DQ
- Phone:
- 01613768264
- Email:
- stna@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window