COASTLANDS LOCAL HISTORY GROUP (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2018-2019 Trustees organised 8 talks,1 visit, 2 exhibitions and 1 visit from a local primary school. Members are working with 5 other community groups to digitise our archives. Links were kept with other local history groups, members worked on projects run by National bodies and local bodies. Trustees have worked to promote the history, heritage and culture of our area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 10 November 2015: CIO registration
- CLHG (CIO) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE CLARE EVANS | Chair | 16 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Philip Marshall | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Royle | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Morrell | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP HENRY EDWARDS | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS IRA HEMIGWAY | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET CHARLOTTE BISHOP | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|||||
MRS ANN BARKWORTH | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MILDRED MARGARET REYNOLDS | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS MARY LEWIS | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HILARY JEAN ORTON | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £12.33k | £237 | £672 | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £2.33k | £1.16k | £6.22k | £3.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF COASTLANDS LOCAL HISTORY GROUP (CIO) ARE:- TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, HERITAGE AND CULTURE OF DALE, MARLOES, ST BRIDES AND ST ISHMAEL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH RESEARCH, COMPILING OF RECORDS, PUBLICATION OF BOOKS AND LEAFLETS, ARRANGING LECTURES, MEETINGS, EVENTS, EXHIBITIONS AND BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ARCHIVE CONTAINING INFORMATION, ARTIFACTS AND PHOTOGRAPHS AND THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE CENTRE; AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STABLES
SOUTH STREET
DALE
HAVERFORDWEST
SA62 3RE
- Phone:
- 01646636668
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window