Financial history OLD RADNOR PARISH HALL (WALTON HALL)

Charity Number: 507121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.91k £14.64k £13.87k £4.25k £3.41k
Total expenditure £15.25k £11.93k £21.68k £2.05k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.40k £10.80k N/A N/A