Financial history EMBRACE CHILD VICTIMS OF CRIME

Charity number: 1166103
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £703.25k £727.70k £629.48k £831.75k £854.24k
Total expenditure £672.42k £555.51k £765.94k £850.79k £988.76k
Income from government contracts N/A £100.00k N/A £52.50k N/A
Income from government grants £70.00k £100.00k £333.70k £474.20k £487.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £140.46k £724.69k £629.40k £831.11k £219.31k
Income - Other trading activities £29.20k £3.00k £50 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £423.73k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40 £6 £38 £637 £0
Income - Other £109.82k £0 £0 £0 £634.92k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £488.24k £482.16k £724.26k £807.81k £988.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds £184.18k £73.35k £41.68k £42.99k £0
Expenditure - Governance £225 £10.13k £15.92k £13.68k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0