EMBRACE CHILD VICTIMS OF CRIME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving poverty, trauma, sickness and distress arising therefrom among children resident in England, Scotland, Wales, Northern Ireland, Channel Islands and the Isle of Man who have suffered the same as a result of any criminal offence committed by any person.. Promoting children's health, education and welfare, encourage their social inclusion. Provision of counselling and emotional support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£854,237
Donations and legacies | £219.31k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £634.92k |
Total expenditure:
£988,758
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £988.76k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £487,112 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £988.76k |
People

8 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 March 2016: CIO registration
- 25 April 2017: Funds received from 1043101 EMBRACE CHILD VICTIMS OF CRIME
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Robert Bailey CBE QPM DL | Chair | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Giles Rackley Orpen-Smellie | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Whiting | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Cox | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Anne Pinner | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Carl James Dickinson | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Shapland | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £703.25k | £727.70k | £629.48k | £831.75k | £854.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £672.42k | £555.51k | £765.94k | £850.79k | £988.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £100.00k | N/A | £52.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.00k | £100.00k | £333.70k | £474.20k | £487.11k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £140.46k | £724.69k | £629.40k | £831.11k | £219.31k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £29.20k | £3.00k | £50 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £423.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £40 | £6 | £38 | £637 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £109.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £634.92k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £488.24k | £482.16k | £724.26k | £807.81k | £988.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £184.18k | £73.35k | £41.68k | £42.99k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £225 | £10.13k | £15.92k | £13.68k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.47k | £2.60k | £4.74k | £6.30k | £4.73k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £273.25k | £469.21k | £311.84k | £314.46k | £268.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £27.41k | £50.32k | £31.54k | £54.77k | £141.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Mar 2016 as amended on 18 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, TRAUMA AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM AMONG CHILDREN RESIDENT IN ENGLAND, SCOTLAND, WALES, NORTHERN IRELAND, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE SAME AS A RESULT OF ANY CRIMINAL OFFENCE COMMITTED BY ANY PERSON OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER AND IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING YOUNG VICTIMS OF CRIME THROUGH, IN PARTICULAR, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT, LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND THE PROVISION OF SMALL ECONOMIC RESOURCES AND SAFETY INFORMATION. 2. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF PERSONAL SAFETY INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Town Hall
Market Place
Oundle
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4BA
- Phone:
- 0345 60 999 60
- Email:
- info@embracecvoc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window