Financial history THE CONNECTIONS BUS PROJECT

Charity number: 1168343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.99k £83.84k £95.11k £136.59k £160.11k
Total expenditure £139.29k £78.66k £110.14k £126.37k £159.27k
Income from government contracts £43.54k £23.61k £70.38k £25.58k £111.98k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £9.75k N/A