STEVE BERNARD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by assisting through the raising and distribution of funds and the provision of facilities for the playing and coaching of sport and which will be in memory of Steve Bernard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Poole
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY STEPHEN BERNARD | Chair | 07 February 2006 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Fleur Love | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Love | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS O'HARA | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DUNSFORD | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WENDY STEELE | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BERNARD | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUES DAVID BERNARD | Trustee | 21 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG MATHIE | Trustee | 25 July 2007 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES RYAN | Trustee | 17 February 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.40k | £13.12k | £21.53k | £44.43k | £140.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.53k | £24.09k | £20.77k | £51.54k | £58.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY ASSISTING THROUGH THE RAISING AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING AND COACHING OF SPORT AND WHICH WILL BE IN MEMORY OF STEVE BERNARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 PINE ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH9 1NA
- Phone:
- 01202466989
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window