Trustees CHANDOS & DENT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 1168158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norman Clive Carter Chair 26 July 2021
None on record
Martin Maxted Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Richard Hawkins Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Mark Tonkin Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Lynne Catherine Buckingham Trustee 08 August 2022
None on record
Charles Marriott Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Brenda May Cove Trustee 20 November 2016
None on record
Michael Derek Hill Trustee 20 November 2016
None on record
Heather Elizabeth Simonds Trustee 20 November 2016
None on record