CUMBRIA LGBT PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cumbria LGBT Pride support the LGBT plus community in Cumbria. Our mission is to increase LGBT plus visibility with an aim of raising awareness and improving community understanding. We achieve this by arranging and attending activities, social events, information sharing days, offering support, delivering training, and by holding an annual main Pride event.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Lester Reeves | Chair | 17 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Peter George Harrison | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Karyn Wood | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Cameron-Parker | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane-ann Clark | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.90k | £16.08k | £39.74k | £44.36k | £48.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.42k | £14.20k | £46.80k | £39.85k | £52.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 May 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY & DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE LIVING IN CUMBRIA & THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: I. RAISING AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES & DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL & TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE. II. CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY & DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH LGBT PEOPLE & THEIR FAMILIES IN CUMBRIA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED IN ORDER TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE & TO ASSIST TO INTEGRATE IN TO SOCIETY. 3. TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, & TRANSGENDER PERSONS IN CUMBRIA BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 4. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND & WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 7
Carlyle's Court
St Mary's Gate
Carlisle
CA3 8RY
- Phone:
- 07369251529
- Email:
- info@cumbriapride.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window