Financial history THE BRADFORD PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED AND ABLE BODIED CLUBS

Charity number: 507255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.19k £15.74k £19.64k £12.98k £23.38k
Total expenditure £20.66k £12.63k £18.70k £14.81k £23.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A