Financial history NIAB EMR

Charity number: 1165055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.76m £7.30m £666.20k £50.00k £17.00k
Total expenditure £5.42m £5.51m £691.30k £52.00k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.26m N/A £52.06k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.12m £7.18m £666.20k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £518.00k £118.00k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £125.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.42m £5.51m £691.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £8.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A