THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD CALVARY LOVE CITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RCCG - Calvary Love City Chester had a variety of activities and events towards achieving it objectives of advancing the Christian faith - Water and Holy Spirit Baptismal Class for new convert.Conferences were also held for young people tagged "Addiction For Jesus" and CLCC Leaders retreat. Calvary Love City Christmas community outreach (visit to residential care home).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 10 October 2016: Standard registration
- RCCG CALVARY LOVE CITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIDEMI KAZEEM AJADI | Chair | 08 July 2015 |
|
|||||
OLUWAKEMI SHEKINAH FAKOYA | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER ITOHAN ITEMAN | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.42k | £85.35k | £121.90k | £148.29k | £215.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.22k | £42.29k | £71.82k | £90.76k | £125.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST WHICH IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Scafell Close
ELLESMERE PORT
CH66 1TZ
- Phone:
- 07878263499
- Email:
- info@rccgcalvarylovecity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window