Financial history COCKERMOUTH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 1166275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £4.66k £5.11k £3.57k £2.66k £4.71k
Total expenditure £7.46k £18.46k £9.27k £6.55k £5.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A