Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE SOUTH LINCOLNSHIRE

Charity number: 1165743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £551.83k £756.41k £873.77k £835.79k £901.14k
Total expenditure £542.08k £668.41k £840.02k £864.32k £974.70k
Income from government contracts £269.40k N/A £306.63k £216.35k £64.27k
Income from government grants £269.40k £285.35k N/A £81.23k £220.91k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84k £4.97k £3.45k £6.94k £10.19k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.29k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £744.80k £866.35k £813.06k £853.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £794 £1.05k £946 £3.29k £9.09k
Income - Other £281.63k £5.59k £3.02k £12.51k £23.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £542.08k £668.41k £840.02k £864.32k £972.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.44k £2.99k £5.37k £0 £2.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.67k