Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE SOUTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Charity number: 1165743

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monica Stark | Chair | 10 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Timothy Jubb | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Wadsworth | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lucy Jane McLoughlin | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Haw | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Simon Hallewell | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary West | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY GIBBS | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SAMEENA BASHIR ALLADIN | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.