THE W P H CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To prevent, relieve and cure sickness of every kind by providing facilities directly or indirectly to achieve those objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 March 1978: Standard registration
- WARWICKSHIRE PRIVATE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Exon | Chair | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Tonks | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jagdeep Sandher | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Keith Short | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Walker | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Gabathuler | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Perkins | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MORRIS | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Martin John Turner | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Marguerie | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Berridge | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARAKATHAM VENKATARAMAN | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Peter Dermot Joseph Handslip | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.78k | £210.24k | £53.70k | £19.40k | £24.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.29k | £389.23k | £346.77k | £379.19k | £426.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JULY 1993, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 9 JUNE 1995 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 JUNE 1996. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF EVERY KIND ( INCLUDING PHYSICAL INJURES) AND TO PROMOTE HEALTH IN ANY WAY WHICH SHALL BE FOR THE TIME BEING CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR(BUT WITHOUT EITHER DEROGATING FROM THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING OR EXTENDING THE SCOPE THEREOF TO OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT IN LAW CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE FOR PATIENTS RESIDENT(AND IF THOUGHT FIT NON-RESIDENT) IN NURSING HOMES, HOSPITAL PAY BEDS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blythe Liggins Llp
Edmund House
Rugby Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 6EL
- Phone:
- 01926831231
- Email:
- lh@blytheliggins.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window