Financial history BURBAGE COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1165707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.02k £18.44k £17.09k £9.49k £10.10k
Total expenditure £7.02k £6.59k £15.15k £11.27k £8.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.90k
Income from government grants £4.02k £15.16k £2.11k £2.46k £1.90k