Financial history THE FRIENDS OF PATRINGTON CHURCH

Charity number: 507331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44 £26 £3.91k £2.46k £1.50k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £797 £784 £935
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A