GREATER TOGETHER MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Greater Together Manchester aims to provide leadership and support for anti-poverty work across Greater Manchester and Rossendale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £78,984 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 17 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip John Cansdale | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Nike Hale | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Anne Elizabeth Gilbert | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Martin William Evans | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Joanna Watson | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Grace Thomas | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
The Right Reverend Mark Davies | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £404.72k | £370.37k | £226.25k | £323.75k | £239.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.92k | £340.87k | £232.02k | £227.06k | £357.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £154.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £183.26k | £34.41k | £69.51k | £73.40k | £78.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAR 2015 as amended on 20 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHRISTIAN BASED CHARITIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS OR ANY ONE OF THEM, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFRASTRUCTURE PROVISION; AND 3.2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. THE OBJECTS ARE TO BE CONDUCTED IN A MANNER WHICH IS CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greater Together Manchester
St John's House
155-163 The Rock
Bury
BL9 0ND
- Phone:
- 0161 828 1409
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window