Financial history APPLAUSE RURAL TOURING

Charity number: 1165632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £447.24k £537.82k £287.71k £294.16k £454.81k
Total expenditure £455.95k £272.95k £381.42k £445.21k £423.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.00k £29.50k £32.61k £32.00k £23.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £532.42k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £3.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £1.67k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £272.49k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £455 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £720 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A