Trustees APPLAUSE RURAL TOURING
Charity number: 1165632

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Searle | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Cusimano | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Pencavel | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Newall | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel King | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Knight | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Portman Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.