Financial history TORFAEN MUSEUM TRUST LTD

Charity number: 507419
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £115.59k £180.07k £83.25k £190.86k £88.32k
Total expenditure £108.97k £125.20k £132.65k £156.81k £138.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £160.31k £63.20k £160.64k £73.97k