Financial history PENZANCE LITERARY FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1168422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £500 £0 £7.00k £12.37k £16.30k
Total expenditure £80 £136 £9.28k £12.65k £12.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A £250 £1.00k £3.00k