Accounts and annual returns BRITISH INDIAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1169838
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 April 2025 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 April 2025 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2024 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 November 2024 281 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 April 2023 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 April 2023 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 July 2022 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 July 2022 164 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window