Financial history UNION CHAPEL

Charity number: 1172808
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £208.40k £166.63k £165.96k £248.05k £388.21k
Total expenditure £167.08k £122.81k £142.65k £203.26k £310.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £78.02k £135.79k