Financial history CITY TO CITY UK

Charity number: 1167859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £77.81k £200.53k £443.94k £434.47k £359.84k
Total expenditure £51.79k £122.80k £479.41k £446.06k £414.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A